open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

MISSISSIPPI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00562
    Party Name:Greenwood v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Memorandum]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case Upon Consent]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA (Social Security)]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?104778
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =