open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

MISSISSIPPI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00561
    Party Name:Walton v. Carnival Corporation et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred Out - District]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Staying Discovery]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Change Venue]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?104775
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =