open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

MISSISSIPPI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00113
    Party Name:Shelter Mutual Insurance Company v. Jones et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Authorizing Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335)]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335)]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?104763
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =