open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

MISSISSIPPI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00560
    Party Name:Bhattarai et al v. Hood et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rebuttal]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Staying Discovery]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?104769
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =