open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

MISSISSIPPI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00653
    Party Name:Milam v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:December 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice fee paid(credit card)]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice Request Letter]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?105376
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =