open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

MISSISSIPPI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00840
    Party Name:Britton v. Errington et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attachment]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Waiver of Service]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Change of Address]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Payment Schedule Opsp6]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Receipt and Cert. (PSP3)]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Opsp2]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed IFP 1983]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?106284
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =