open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

MISSISSIPPI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00039-1
    Party Name:USA v. Ware
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply to Response]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Compel]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Digital Audio File]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Discovery]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial Order]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Case]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?104533
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =