U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whavers et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Response in Opposition]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Response to Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [USCA Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response to Order]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 02, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • November 04, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • November 04, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 13, 2022: [Compel]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 05, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 26, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 25, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 15, 2022: [Compel]
  • April 05, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 01, 2022: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 25, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 21, 2022: [Change of Address]
  • March 03, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • March 02, 2022: [Transcript Request]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • January 14, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • January 06, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • January 03, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 29, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 29, 2021: [Compel]
  • December 28, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 27, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 22, 2021: [Letter]
  • December 21, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 21, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 20, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 17, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • December 15, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 15, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 15, 2021: [In Chambers Conference]
  • December 13, 2021: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • December 13, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 08, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 08, 2021: [Suppress]
  • December 07, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 07, 2021: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2021
  • November 28, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 07, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 13, 2021: [Dismiss]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 09, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 09, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order]
  • August 27, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • July 26, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 23, 2021: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • June 17, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order]
  • May 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2021: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • March 29, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 22, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order]
  • March 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Continue]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 09, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 07, 2021: [Judgment]
  • January 07, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 07, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 07, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • January 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 07, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order]
  • January 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 02, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 02, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 18, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 09, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order]
  • November 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • October 08, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 02, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 02, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 02, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 02, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 02, 2020: [Response]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 21, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 21, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 21, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • September 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 11, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 11, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 02, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 27, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • August 04, 2020: [Remark]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • July 23, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • June 14, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 02, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 26, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 14, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 08, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 13, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 09, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 03, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 03, 2020: [Revoke]
  • April 03, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • April 02, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 02, 2020: [Continue]
  • April 02, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 02, 2020: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Bill of Particulars]
  • January 17, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 16, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 06, 2020: [Bill of Particulars]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Bill of Particulars]
  • December 18, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 18, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 18, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 16, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 11, 2019: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • December 04, 2019: [Substitute Attorney]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 03, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 27, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 26, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2019: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 21, 2019: [Restricted Document]
  • November 21, 2019: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.