U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lumpkin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 04, 2022: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 26, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • July 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 26, 2022: [Unseal Document]
  • July 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 05, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • November 05, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.