U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 16, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Letter]
  • June 08, 2021: [Letter]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 06, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Digital Audio File (SEALED)]
  • April 22, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 22, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 22, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • April 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 25, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 17, 2020: [Remark]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 02, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 01, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 01, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 01, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 31, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 19, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 19, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • August 19, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 19, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 19, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • August 07, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • July 22, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 21, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 22, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 16, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 16, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 16, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • June 16, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 16, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 16, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 16, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • June 11, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 09, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 10, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 10, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • November 22, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 22, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 22, 2019: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.