open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

MISSISSIPPI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00875
    Party Name:Rosella v. CRC Insurance Services, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
    Date Published:May 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Deadline]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?106565
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =