open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

MISSISSIPPI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00916
    Party Name:Perkins v. Middlebrooks et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Partial Payment of Filing Fee]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Waiver of Service]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Payment Schedule Opsp6]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Authorization for Release of Account Information and Certificate]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Receipt and Cert. (PSP3)]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Opsp8]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Opsp2]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed IFP 1983]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?106569
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =