open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

MISSISSIPPI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00915
    Party Name:United States of America v. $83,400.00 United States Currency
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Default]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service by Publication]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Warrant Returned]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application for Warrant of Arrest in Rem]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?106568
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =