open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

MISSISSIPPI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:20-cv-00128
    Party Name:Amerson v. King et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Receipt and Cert. (PSP3)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Opsp2]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed IFP 1983]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?107374
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =