open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

MISSISSIPPI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00057
    Party Name:Comeaux et al v. Moore et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:September 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:July 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Subpoena Returned]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
    Date Published:June 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Restricted Document]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?107377
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =