open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

MISSISSIPPI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:20-cv-00087
    Party Name:Joiner v. SRC Tracewood Investments, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Subpoena Returned]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Take Deposition]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:June 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
    Date Published:June 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
    Date Published:June 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [State Court Record]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?107376
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =