open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

MISSISSIPPI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:1:20-cr-00022-1
    Party Name:USA v. Quagliaroli
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:June 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:June 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:June 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:June 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:June 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal or Restrict Document]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal or Restrict Document]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Digital Audio File]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Discovery]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial Order]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Case]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?107351
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =