U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Damien Hayes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Remark]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 02, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 02, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 02, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 02, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 08, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 12, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 12, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 12, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • May 12, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 12, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • May 12, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 06, 2020: [Unseal Case]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 05, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 05, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.