U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 11, 2020: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 08, 2020: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 08, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 08, 2020: [Sentencing]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 22, 2020: [Continue]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 11, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 11, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 11, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • May 14, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • May 14, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 14, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • May 14, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • May 14, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 11, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 08, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 08, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • May 08, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 08, 2020: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.