U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gibbs
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 04, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 04, 2024: [Restricted Document]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - 2023 USSC Amendment 821]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 25, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 30, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 23, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 23, 2021: [Sentencing]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 16, 2021: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 15, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 17, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • March 17, 2021: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • March 17, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 17, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 19, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 05, 2021: [Remark]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 10, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 10, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 08, 2020: [Continue]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Sealed Document]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 22, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 16, 2020: [Suppress]
  • June 05, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • May 27, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 27, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • May 19, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 19, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • May 19, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 15, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • May 12, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • May 12, 2020: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.