U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:04-cr-00132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Simmons
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Mail Returned]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • July 06, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • June 30, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal or Restrict]
  • June 30, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 25, 2020: [Seal or Restrict]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order]
  • June 24, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.