U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 08, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 08, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 08, 2020: [Plea and Sentence]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 19, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 19, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 18, 2020: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 20, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • May 20, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 20, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 14, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • May 14, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • May 14, 2020: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.