U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fennel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • January 19, 2023: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 12, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 11, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 03, 2023: [Change of Address]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Letter]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 12, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 11, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 11, 2021: [Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2021
  • January 09, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 06, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 06, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 06, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 05, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Continue]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Response to Order]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order]
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 04, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 04, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 29, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 29, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 29, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 23, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 11, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 11, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 19, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 19, 2020: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • May 19, 2020: [Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment Entry of Not Guilty Plea]
  • May 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 14, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • May 14, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • May 14, 2020: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.