U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Godoy-Acencio
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 02, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 02, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 02, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 02, 2020: [Plea and Sentence]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 20, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • May 20, 2020: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • May 20, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 20, 2020: [Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment Entry of Not Guilty Plea]
  • May 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • May 14, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • May 14, 2020: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.