U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sierra-Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 26, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 26, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 26, 2020: [Plea and Sentence]
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2020: [Remark]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 16, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 16, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 19, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • May 19, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 19, 2020: [Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment Entry of Not Guilty Plea]
  • May 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • May 14, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • May 14, 2020: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.