U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia-Morales
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 30, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 03, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 03, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 30, 2020: [Plea and Sentence]
  • July 10, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 10, 2020: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • July 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 17, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 19, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • May 19, 2020: [Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment Entry of Not Guilty Plea]
  • May 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 14, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • May 14, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • May 14, 2020: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.