U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tucker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 03, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 01, 2020: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 01, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 17, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 03, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 02, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 02, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 02, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • August 19, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 19, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [Remark]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 29, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 29, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 29, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order]
  • July 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 16, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 20, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • May 19, 2020: [Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment Entry of Not Guilty Plea]
  • May 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • May 14, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • May 14, 2020: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.