U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Abreu et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Remark]
  • January 09, 2023: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [USCA Order]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • July 18, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [USCA Order]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • March 22, 2022: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 15, 2022: [Sealed Transcript]
  • February 15, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • February 09, 2022: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • February 09, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 02, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • January 31, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 30, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 28, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 28, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • January 27, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 27, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • January 25, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • January 21, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 21, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 21, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • January 21, 2022: [Sealed Transcript]
  • January 20, 2022: [Amended Notice of Appeal]
  • January 14, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 07, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • January 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 06, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2022: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • January 05, 2022: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • January 05, 2022: [Sentencing]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • December 21, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 10, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • December 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 28, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 24, 2021: [Transcript Request]
  • November 17, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 17, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 16, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 16, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • November 16, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 10, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • November 10, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • November 10, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • November 10, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 10, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 10, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 08, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 05, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 05, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 04, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 04, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • November 04, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Judgment NOV]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 15, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 01, 2021: [Remark]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 27, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 02, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • September 01, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 09, 2021: [Judgment NOV]
  • August 09, 2021: [New Trial]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 05, 2021: [Judgment NOV]
  • August 05, 2021: [New Trial]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 03, 2021: [Seal or Restrict]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 29, 2021: [Subpoena Returned]
  • July 28, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 28, 2021: [Jury Verdict (Un-Redacted)]
  • July 28, 2021: [Jury Verdict (Redacted)]
  • July 28, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • July 23, 2021: [Bill of Particulars]
  • July 23, 2021: [Vacate]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 19, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • July 16, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • July 16, 2021: [James Hearing]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 16, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 16, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 15, 2021: [In Limine]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 13, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • July 12, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Hearing]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • July 07, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 07, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 23, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 18, 2021: [Suppress]
  • June 16, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 15, 2021: [Suppress]
  • June 15, 2021: [Sever Defendant]
  • June 15, 2021: [Exclude]
  • June 15, 2021: [In Limine]
  • June 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2021: [Produce]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • June 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • May 03, 2021: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 15, 2021: [Sealed Document]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 05, 2021: [In Limine]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2020: [In Limine]
  • December 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 04, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order]
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • November 20, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • November 13, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash Indictment/Information]
  • October 22, 2020: [Response]
  • October 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 20, 2020: [Response]
  • October 19, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 16, 2020: [Sever Defendant]
  • October 16, 2020: [Produce]
  • October 14, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 09, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 09, 2020: [In Limine]
  • October 06, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 06, 2020: [Quash Indictment/Information]
  • October 06, 2020: [Sever Defendant]
  • October 05, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 05, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 03, 2020: [Sever Defendant]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 16, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 08, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 03, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 27, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 27, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 27, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 27, 2020: [Appear]
  • August 27, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 27, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 27, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • August 26, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 25, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 25, 2020: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 24, 2020: [Produce]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 21, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 20, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 18, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • August 17, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 17, 2020: [In Limine]
  • August 13, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • August 13, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash Indictment/Information]
  • August 06, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 06, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order]
  • August 03, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • July 27, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order]
  • July 21, 2020: [Bill of Particulars]
  • July 21, 2020: [Bond]
  • July 21, 2020: [Quash Indictment/Information]
  • July 21, 2020: [Return of Property/PreTrial]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 17, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 16, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 15, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 12, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 12, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • June 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 11, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 19, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 19, 2020: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • May 19, 2020: [Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment Entry of Not Guilty Plea]
  • May 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • May 14, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • May 14, 2020: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.