U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • November 03, 2022: [Vacate]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 25, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 23, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 23, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 23, 2021: [Restricted Document]
  • February 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 23, 2021: [Sentencing]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 22, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 22, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 22, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • October 13, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2020: [Remark]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 22, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • June 22, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 15, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 11, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 11, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • June 11, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • June 11, 2020: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 19, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 19, 2020: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • May 19, 2020: [Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment Entry of Not Guilty Plea]
  • May 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 14, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • May 14, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • May 14, 2020: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.