U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quarles
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 01, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 30, 2020: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 30, 2020: [Sentencing]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 27, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 27, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 27, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 27, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 27, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 27, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2020: [Remark]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 11, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 27, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 27, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 19, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 19, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 19, 2020: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • May 19, 2020: [Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment Entry of Not Guilty Plea]
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 14, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • May 14, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • May 14, 2020: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • May 14, 2020: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.