U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bohl
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 13, 2025: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • May 13, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2025: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 22, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Unseal Document]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 07, 2020: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 01, 2020: [Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 30, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 30, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 30, 2020: [Sentencing]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 01, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 31, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 31, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 31, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 31, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 19, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 17, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2020: [Remark]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • July 14, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 01, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • July 01, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 01, 2020: [Arraignment]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 24, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • June 24, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • June 24, 2020: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.