U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walters
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 01, 2025: [Restricted Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - 2023 USSC Amendment 821]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • May 23, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • May 19, 2022: [Clarify]
  • May 19, 2022: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
  • May 17, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 17, 2022: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order]
  • May 06, 2022: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 16, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 19, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 27, 2021: [Writ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • September 21, 2021: [Clarify]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 25, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 23, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 02, 2021: [Discovery]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • April 02, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 02, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2021: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 18, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 18, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • March 11, 2021: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order]
  • March 07, 2021: [Set Aside Forfeiture]
  • March 07, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 09, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 08, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 02, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 02, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 02, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • January 28, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 27, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 19, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 15, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 15, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 15, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 15, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • January 14, 2021: [Hearing]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 14, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 14, 2021: [Restricted Document]
  • January 14, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • January 13, 2021: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • January 12, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • January 11, 2021: [Trial Brief]
  • January 11, 2021: [Hearing]
  • January 08, 2021: [Hearing]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order]
  • January 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 11, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • December 09, 2020: [Travel]
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Restricted Motion]
  • December 04, 2020: [Restricted Motion]
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • December 02, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 25, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 19, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 19, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • November 19, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 13, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 09, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 09, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Service by Publication]
  • October 30, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 20, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 20, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • October 19, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 08, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ]
  • September 09, 2020: [Writ]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • July 13, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 13, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal or Restrict]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 13, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • July 13, 2020: [Digital Audio File (SEALED)]
  • July 13, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 13, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • July 13, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 10, 2020: [Seal or Restrict]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 10, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 10, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 09, 2020: [Order]
  • July 09, 2020: [Waiver]
  • July 09, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 09, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 09, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • July 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • July 09, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • July 09, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.