open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

MISSISSIPPI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00251
    Party Name:Mossy Motors of Mississippi, LLP et al v. Maguire Iron, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?108967
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =