open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

MISSISSIPPI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:3:20-cv-00515
    Party Name:Wooten v. Warren County, Mississippi et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?109018
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =