open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

MISSISSIPPI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:20-02144-
    Party Name:Shemika R Doss and Detri L Doss
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, T1 Derek A [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, T1 Derek A [Meeting of Creditors Held (batch)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, T1 Derek A [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, T1 Derek A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, T1 Derek A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, T1 Derek A [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, T1 Derek A [Chapter 7 Auto Assignment]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, T1 Derek A [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mssb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?301996
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =