open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Mississippi

MISSISSIPPI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:20-12517-
    Party Name:Tony Byrd, Jr.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Levingston, Jeffrey A. [Show Cause]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Levingston, Jeffrey A. [Notice of Hearing by Telephonic Conference]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Levingston, Jeffrey A. [Meeting of Creditors Convened/Not Held]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Levingston, Jeffrey A. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Levingston, Jeffrey A. [Notice of Delinquent Filing Fee]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Levingston, Jeffrey A. [BNC Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Levingston, Jeffrey A. [Notice of Telephonic 341 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Levingston, Jeffrey A. [AutoAssign Judge - Ch 7 Trustee - Ind NoAsset]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Levingston, Jeffrey A. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Levingston, Jeffrey A. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.msnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?180911
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =