U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 03, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 03, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 03, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 08, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 08, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 12, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 19, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 08, 2020: [Continue]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 21, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 20, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • August 20, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • August 20, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 20, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 17, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 14, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • August 12, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • August 12, 2020: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.