U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bowie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 28, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 17, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 15, 2021: [Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 13, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 02, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Trial Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 15, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • June 30, 2021: [Restricted Document]
  • June 30, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • June 16, 2021: [Attachment]
  • June 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [Bond]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • June 11, 2021: [Trial Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 11, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • August 12, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • August 12, 2020: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.