U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 23, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 18, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 10, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 23, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 17, 2022: [Remark]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 09, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 09, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 22, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 08, 2022: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 08, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 07, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 20, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 12, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 11, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 06, 2022: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • January 05, 2022: [Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 18, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 11, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 06, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 06, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 22, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 15, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 21, 2021: [Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • May 17, 2021: [Continue]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 22, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order of Recusal]
  • April 14, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 07, 2021: [Attachment]
  • April 06, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 06, 2021: [Bond]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 06, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • April 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 06, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Attachment]
  • April 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 02, 2021: [Trial Order]
  • April 02, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • April 02, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 02, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Discovery]
  • March 31, 2021: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • March 31, 2021: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • March 31, 2021: [Restricted Document]
  • March 31, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 24, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 15, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 15, 2021: [Appear]
  • March 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 16, 2020: [Subpoena Returned]
  • November 13, 2020: [Subpoena Returned]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 23, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • October 22, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • October 22, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 02, 2020: [Quash]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 29, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 11, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 11, 2020: [Attachment]
  • September 11, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • September 03, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 02, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 02, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • September 02, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 02, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 01, 2020: [Unseal Case]
  • September 01, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.