U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jeems
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Psychiatric Report]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [Response]
  • May 27, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 27, 2022: [Restricted Document]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Sealed Document]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Sealed Document]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • July 23, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • July 22, 2021: [Competency Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Psychiatric Report]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 06, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 18, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • September 18, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 18, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • September 17, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 11, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 11, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • September 10, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • September 10, 2020: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.