open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

MISSISSIPPI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:5:20-cv-00181
    Party Name:Morales et al v. Gillis et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Service]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Temporary Restraining Order]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mssd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?109454
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =