U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Daniels
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 08, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 07, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • October 07, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • September 24, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 24, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 24, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 24, 2020: [Unseal Document]
  • September 24, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.