U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scott
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Response]
  • January 19, 2023: [Attachment]
  • January 17, 2023: [Response]
  • January 09, 2023: [Attachment]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Attachment]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Attachment]
  • October 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 26, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 13, 2022: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • September 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • June 28, 2022: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Attachment]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 13, 2022: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • December 03, 2021: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • November 16, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • November 10, 2021: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • November 08, 2021: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • November 02, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • October 25, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 21, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 19, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 14, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 14, 2021: [Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Status Conference]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 02, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 21, 2021: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 21, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 21, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 19, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 17, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 03, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • February 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 05, 2021: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • February 01, 2021: [Trial Order]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Order]
  • January 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 17, 2020: [Remark]
  • December 01, 2020: [Trial Order]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 29, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 24, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 09, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • October 09, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 05, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 02, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 02, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 02, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 02, 2020: [Arraignment]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 29, 2020: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.