U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Evans
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment - 2255]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 08, 2022: [Affidavit]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 26, 2022: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 06, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 02, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 01, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • April 01, 2021: [Sentencing]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 17, 2020: [Remark]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • November 24, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 24, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 24, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2020: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 06, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 05, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 02, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 02, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 01, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • October 01, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 01, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 01, 2020: [Arraignment]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 29, 2020: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.