U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Javarius Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Remark]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 31, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 07, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 04, 2020: [Order of Recusal]
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 03, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • December 03, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 23, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 23, 2020: [Revoke]
  • November 20, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 19, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 18, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • November 18, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 18, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 18, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 18, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • November 18, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.