U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Floyd
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 02, 2022: [Sentencing]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 22, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Remark]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.