U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barnes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 05, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 15, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • January 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 08, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.