U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Speed
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 07, 2022: [Vacate]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • September 10, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Restitution Hearing]
  • August 16, 2021: [Show Cause Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 16, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 03, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 03, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 01, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • February 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 14, 2021: [Trial Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 14, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • January 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 14, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • January 12, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.