U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brumfield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Digital Audio File]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • January 24, 2022: [Vacate]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Restricted Document]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 10, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 08, 2021: [Restricted Document]
  • November 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 06, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 06, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 14, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 05, 2021: [Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 26, 2021: [Order]
  • February 26, 2021: [Trial Order]
  • February 26, 2021: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 26, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 25, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • February 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 13, 2021: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • January 13, 2021: [Restricted Document]
  • January 13, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.