U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Sealed Transcript]
  • November 22, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 22, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • October 28, 2021: [Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 02, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 25, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 25, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • May 06, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Trial Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 08, 2021: [Continue]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 19, 2021: [Trial Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • January 19, 2021: [Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment Entry of Not Guilty Plea]
  • January 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 13, 2021: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • January 13, 2021: [Restricted Document]
  • January 13, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.